Anthony Rini et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Rini and Sheila A. Rini
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07631
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 9/23/2020, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #9 . A written response to the Order to Show Cause was ordered to be filed no later than 10/7/2020. No response having been filed to the Court's Order to Show Cause, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the case is dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the orders of the Court, pursuant to Local Rule 41. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 10/7/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) response. If plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) files: An answer by defendant(s) FCA US LLC; or, Plaintiff(s) application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to defendant(s) FCA US LLC, on or before the date indicated above, the Court will consider this a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Certification NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant FCA US LLC, (Montoya, Phil)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Montoya, Phil)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The case initiating documents were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Anthony Rini in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/24/2020, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV23923 Receipt No: ACACDC-27737559 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mari Kiridjian ISO Remova, #2 Appendix Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Attorney Phil J Montoya, Jr added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Montoya, Phil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Rini et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rini
Represented By: Kevin A Alexander, II
Represented By: William R McGee
Represented By: Deanna M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila A. Rini
Represented By: Kevin A Alexander, II
Represented By: William R McGee
Represented By: Deanna M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Phil J Montoya, Jr
Represented By: Barry R Schirm
Represented By: Phil J. Montoya, Jr.
Represented By: Mari Kiridjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?