Andrew Rudick v. The United States Department of the Treasury
Plaintiff: Andrew Rudick
Defendant: The United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 2:2020cv07634
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick(Rudick, Andrew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melissa Briggs counsel for Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury. Adding Melissa Briggs as counsel of record for The United States Department of the Treasury for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Melissa Briggs added to party The United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft))(Briggs, Melissa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Exhibits)(Rudick, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick, upon Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury served on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. Dela Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (See signature) No printed name. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Name not known. USPS paper domestic receipt not returned.. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. Andrew Rudick (Rudick, Andrew)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (bm)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury. (jtil)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick against Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid.) (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Rudick v. The United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Rudick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Melissa Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?