City of South Pasadena v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: City of South Pasadena
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company, The Dow Chemical Company and Does 1 through 300, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07765
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Sheri Pym
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joint 26(f) Report)(Mansergh, Seth)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 11/02/20 at 11:00 AM (pg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell plc as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, (Smith, Jay)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc.. (Langner, Bailey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07765 MWF(SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena, upon Defendant Shell Oil Company served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena, upon Defendant The Dow Chemical Company served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Shell Oil Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (car)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. per L.R. 83-1.4 (Mansergh, Seth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. Related Case(s): 2:18- cv-10139-MWF-SPx; 5:19-cv-00842-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-00881-MWF-SPx (Mansergh, Seth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena, (Mansergh, Seth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 to Summons)(Mansergh, Seth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. (Mansergh, Seth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27793612 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff City of South Pasadena. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party City of South Pasadena(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of South Pasadena v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Nicole Areli Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Bailey J Langner
Represented By: Nicholas D Kayhan
Represented By: Alessandra M Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 300, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Pasadena
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?