Orlando Garcia v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv07812
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert W Conti on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Robert W Conti added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Conti, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties)(Attorney Charles Michael Cannizzaro added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Cannizzaro, Charles)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:- Becky de George in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27810544 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Robert W Conti
Represented By: Charles Michael Cannizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?