Chrispin Garcia v. People of The State of California et al
Petitioner: Chrispin Garcia
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery and People of The State of California
Case Number: 2:2020cv07849
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-141) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07849 JWH(PVC). (rn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: denying #3 Request for Appointment of Counsel. Nothing in this Order is intended to preclude Petitioner from retaining counsel on his own. (efc)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHOULD NOT RECOMMEND THAT THIS ACTION SHOULD BE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Response to Order to Show Cause due within 30 days of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal Form) (efc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel in a Federal Habeas Corpus Case filed by Petitioner Chrispin Garcia. (lh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Chrispin Garcia. (lh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Chrispin Garcia. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrispin Garcia v. People of The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chrispin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?