Foster Taft v. Ventura County Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Foster Taft
Defendant: Carol Lashbrook and Ventura County Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv07856
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Foster Taft. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Cathy Anderson. (Taft, Foster)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07856 MWF(Ex). (rn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Foster Taft. (shb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Foster Taft. (shb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Carol Lashbrook, Ventura County Medical Center. (car)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Carol Lashbrook, Ventura County Medical Center. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Foster Taft. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster Taft v. Ventura County Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?