L. C. Cunningham v. C. Fpieffer
Petitioner: L. C. Cunningham
Respondent: C. Fpieffer
Case Number: 2:2020cv07903
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter, Related to: Order Summarily Dismissing Petition #8 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: (1) Grounds Two, Four, Five, Seven, Eight, Nine, and Ten, in their entirety, and Grounds One and Six, to the extent they relate to the 2017 parole decision, of the Petition ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (see document for further details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND REFERRING A PORTION THEREOF TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS PURSUANT TO NINTH CIRCUIT RULE 22-3(A) by Judge John F. Walter, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #3 . Petitioner's claims challenging the 2017 parole decision, that is, Grounds Two, Four, Five, Seven, Eight, Nine, and Ten in their entirety and Grounds One and Six to the extent they relate to the 2017 parole decision and not the 1986 conviction, are not cognizable federal habeas claims and are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under Rule 4 of the Habeas Rules. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Petition, #2 Appeal Form 12) (hr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #6 filed by Petitioner L. C. Cunningham (hr)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The Court has reviewed the Petition under Rule 4 of the Habeas Rules and finds it is subject to dismissal for the reasons explained below. For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order why the Petition should not be dismissed because:(see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Ntc of Dismissal) (mba)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: Granting #1 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (mba)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early,(Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner L. C. Cunningham. (esa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE RE: In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Request received without Complaint/Petition mailed to Petitioner L. C. Cunningham. Upon submission of your IFP Request it was noted that you did not submit a complaint/petition. If you do not respond to this notice by submitting a complaint/petition within 30 days of the date of this notice your action will be closed. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #1 (ghap)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 Declaration in Support REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, filed by petitioner L. C. Cunningham. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. C. Cunningham v. C. Fpieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Fpieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L. C. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?