Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Stephen Cummings
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., James Cameron, -, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc. and James Cameron
Defendant: Stephen Cummings
Counter Defendant: Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08044
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counterclaimant Stephen Cummings' Counterclaim [Dkt 22] filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Litvack, Mark)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of Michael R. Kreiner, #4 Exhibit A to Kreiner Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Kreiner Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Kreiner Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Kreiner Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Kreiner Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Kreiner Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Kreiner Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Kreiner Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Kreiner Decl., #13 Exhibit J to Kreiner Decl., #14 Exhibit K to Kreiner Decl., #15 Exhibit L to Kreiner Decl., #16 Exhibit M to Kreiner Decl., #17 Exhibit N to Kreiner Decl., #18 Declaration of Jon Landau, #19 Declaration of Scott Martin, #20 Declaration of Richard Redlich, Jr., #21 Declaration of Daniel F. Grossman, #22 Declaration of James Cameron, #23 [Proposed] Judgment, #24 Proof of Service) (Litvack, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 COUNTERCLAIM against counter defendants James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Dolby Laboratories, Inc., filed by defendant Stephen Cummings. (lc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/JURY TRIAL DEMANDED filed by defendant Stephen Cummings. (lc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF IN RESPONSE to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Stephen Cummings.(lc)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04443 ODW(PVCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08044 ODW(PVCx). Signed by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (rn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff James Cameron. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 Plaintiff James Cameron's Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement (Kreiner, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFF JAMES CAMERON'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff James Cameron. (Kreiner, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. Other error(s) with document(s): Does 1-50 as Plaintiffs not in the Complaint. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Stephen Cummings. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Plaintiff James Cameron's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff James Cameron (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp. (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Plaintiff Paramount Home Entertainment Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Paramount Home Entertainment Inc. (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Plaintiff Paramount Pictures Corporation's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Paramount Pictures Corporation (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Plaintiff Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc. (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.. (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Cameron, Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.. (Litvack, Mark)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27905715 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp., Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, James Cameron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Mark D Litvack added to party James Cameron(pty:pla), Attorney Mark D Litvack added to party Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark D Litvack added to party Paramount Home Entertainment Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark D Litvack added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Mark D Litvack added to party Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.(pty:pla))(Litvack, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Stephen Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Represented By: Michael Richard Kreiner
Represented By: Nathan M Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Home Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Represented By: Michael Richard Kreiner
Represented By: Nathan M Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corp.
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Represented By: Nathan M Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cameron, -
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lightstorm Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Represented By: Michael Richard Kreiner
Represented By: Nathan M Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cameron
Represented By: Michael Richard Kreiner
Represented By: Nathan M Spatz
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dolby Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?