David Ettedgui v. WB Studio Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Ettedgui
Defendant: WB Studio Enterprises Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08053
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM COURT'S INITIAL STANDING ORDER #25 AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS #19 . Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. (lc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from the Court's Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi, Section 9(b) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 Unopposed by Defendant filed by Plaintiff David Ettedgui. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order) (Mukherjee, Ruchira)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Carly B. Epstein)(Pierce, Seth)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc., re Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi served on October 7, 2020. (Pierce, Seth)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 , Request for Judicial Notice #20 served on September 30, 2020. (Pierce, Seth)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENIED RE SETTING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S #18 COMPLAINT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lom)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth E. Pierce, #2 Proposed Order) (Pierce, Seth)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition and Defendant's Reply re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff David Ettedgui. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Charlotte)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-121) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Mark C. Scarsi, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08053-MCS-MAAx. (aco)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08053 DMG(MAAx). (rn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charlotte James on behalf of Plaintiff David Ettedgui (Attorney Charlotte James added to party David Ettedgui(pty:pla))(James, Charlotte)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee on behalf of Plaintiff David Ettedgui (Attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee added to party David Ettedgui(pty:pla))(Mukherjee, Ruchira)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Plaintiff David Ettedgui (Attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio added to party David Ettedgui(pty:pla))(Rivapalacio, Victoria)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to WB Studio Enterprises Inc. answer now due 9/30/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Pierce, Seth)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance re Removal filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc., re Declaration #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Declaration #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #6 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on September 2, 2020. (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, WB Studio Enterprises Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff David Ettedgui. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/29/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
September 2, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Ettedgui, upon Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Carly B Epstein, Attorney for defendant on behalf WB Studio Enterprises Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/5/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc., identifying Plaintiff David Ettedgui; Law Offices of Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP; Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.; Warner Bros. Enterprises LLC (parent of WB Studio Enterprises Inc.); and AT&T Inc. (publicly held corporation and ultimate parent of Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.). (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Shelly Kunz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Silisha S. Platon re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Seth E. Pierce re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Pierce, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV24867 Receipt No: ACACDC-27909010 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, Addendum and Statement of Location, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Voluntary Efficient Stipulations, #6 ADR Packet, #7 Minute Order re Complex Case Determination, #8 Proof of Service re Court Order and Initial Status Conference Order, #9 Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Complaint, #10 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Initial Status Conference, #11 Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Initial Status Conference) (Attorney Seth E Pierce added to party WB Studio Enterprises Inc.(pty:dft))(Pierce, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Ettedgui v. WB Studio Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ettedgui
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Represented By: Nicholas J De Blouw
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Ruchira Piya Mukherjee
Represented By: Kyle R Nordrehaug
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Charlotte James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Studio Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Seth E Pierce
Represented By: Carly B Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?