Nina Q Huang et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tony L. Cummins and Nina Q. Huang
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, BMW of North America, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08157
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 26, 2022 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 26, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tionna Dolin on behalf of Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang (Dolin, Tionna)
April 29, 2022 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT Re Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Law, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #44 by Judge John F. Walter. The request of BMW of North America, LLC to substitute Brian Hom as attorney of record instead of Lisa Weddle and Betty Luu is GRANTED. (iv)
April 21, 2022 Filing 44 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Brian M. Hom in place of attorney Lisa R. Weddle and Betty Luu filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Withdrawal of Attorney) (Weddle, Lisa)
April 15, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Tony L. Cummins(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Nina Q. Huang (pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
April 14, 2022 Filing 42 Text Entry STRIKING #41 MOTION to Substitute attorney Brian M. Hom. Counsel has chosen wrong event and used wrong form. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2022 Filing 41 Stricken** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute attorney Brian M. Hom, Esq. in place of attorney Lisa R. Weddle filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Brian Ming Hom added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft)) (Hom, Brian) Modified on 4/14/2022 (sr).
March 14, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Nina Q. Huang and Tony L. Cummins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Nina Q. Huang and Tony L. Cummins. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Tony L. Cummins(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Nina Q. Huang (pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
January 29, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 18, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 2, 2021 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT Re Status of Arbitration filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Luu, Betty)
May 24, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Betty Luu counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Adding Betty Luu as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Betty Luu added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Luu, Betty)
May 11, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karyn L Ihara counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Karyn L. Ihara is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BMW Of North America, LLC. (Ihara, Karyn)
May 3, 2021 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Status Of Arbitration filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Ihara, Karyn)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS [filed 11/23/20; Docket No. #21 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending the outcome of the arbitration, and the Clerk is ordered to administratively close this case. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 120 days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings, with the first joint status report due on May 5, 2021. Defendant's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (iv)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION MOTION OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS [filed 11/23/20; Docket No. #21 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 4, 2021 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (iv)
December 23, 2020 Filing 31 STATEMENT of Proposed Statement of Decision NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Ihara, Karyn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant BMW Of North America, LLC's Response To Evidentiary Objections To The Declaration Of Karyn L. Ihara In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Sanctions, Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Or Stay All Proceedings)(Ihara, Karyn)
December 9, 2020 Filing 29 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara in Support of Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay All Proceedings Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF KARYN L. IHARA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiff Nina Q. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
December 8, 2020 Filing 28 Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Sogoyan ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctionsn, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dec, #3 Exhibit 2 to Dec, #4 Exhibit 3 to Dec, #5 Exhibit 4 to Dec, #6 Exhibit 5 to Dec, #7 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, #8 Exhibit 1 to RJN, #9 Exhibit 2 to RJN, #10 Exhibit 3 to RJN, #11 Exhibit 4 to RJN, #12 Exhibit 5 to RJN, #13 Exhibit 6 to RJN)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
November 25, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Karyn L. Ihara in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Email chain dated 10/19/20-11/12/20 re LR 7-3 Conference (23 pgs), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Plaintiff's Complaint filed 10/18/18, Case No. 18STCV08842 (15 pgs), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Order dated 3/27/19 granting BMW NA's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Case No. 18STCV08842 (3 pgs), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of BMW Of Monrovia filed 4/3/19, Case No. 18STCV08842 (3 pgs), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Order dated 5/20/19 denying Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration, Case No. 18STCV08842 (2 pgs), #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Minute Order dated 8/25/20 re arbitration status hearing, Case No. 18STCV08842 (1 pg), #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Dismissal of entire action dated 9/10/20, Case No. 18STCV08842 (3 pgs), #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Complaint filed on 5/20/19, Case No. 19STCV17538 (22 pgs), #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - First Amended Complained filed on 7/1/19, Case No. 19STCV17538 (19 pgs), #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - 9/5/19 Order sustaining BMW NA's demurrer, Case No. 19STCV17538 (1 pg), #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Dismissal of entire action dated 10/4/19, Case No. 19STCV17538 (3 pgs), #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Complaint filed on 10/9/19, Case No. 2:19-cv-08702-DSF (24 pgs), #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Complaint filed on 11/4/19, Case No. 19STCV39690 (9 pgs), #14 Exhibit Exh. 14 - 7/7/20 Tentative Order granting BMW NA's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Case No. 19STCV39690 (4 pgs), #15 Exhibit Exh. 15 - Request for dismissal of entire action filed on 7/7/20, Case No. 19STCV39690 (3 pgs), #16 Exhibit Exh. 16 - Transcript from 7/8/20 hearing on BMW NA's motion to compel arbitration, Case No. 19STCV39690 (15 pgs), #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - 7/8/20 Order on BMW NA's motion to compel arbitration, Case No. 19STCV39690 (1 pg), #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Complaint filed on 7/10/20, Case No. 2:20-cv-06197 (17 pgs), #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Complaint filed on 2/26/20, Case No. 20STCV07734 (11 pgs), #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - 9/3/20 Tentative Order granting BMW NA's motion to dismiss, Case No. 20STCV07734 (20 pgs), #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Transcript from hearing on BMW NA's motion to dismiss on 9/3/20, Case No. 20STCV07734 (24 pgs), #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Complaint filed 9/3/20, Case No. 20CV371358 (9 pgs), #23 Exhibit Ex. 23 - "About Us" page from Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP's website (1 pg), #24 Exhibit Ex. 24 - The Wolters Kluwer 2018 Real Rate Report (171 pgs), #25 Exhibit Ex. 25 - 9/26/20 email chain re BMW NA's intended demurrer to Second Amended Complaint, Case No. 19STCV17538 (3 pgs), #26 Exhibit Ex. 26 - 10/22/20 email chain re BMW NA's responses to Request for Production, Case No. 2:19-cv-08702 (5 pgs), #27 Exhibit Ex. 27 - 7/28/20 email chain re BMW NA's intended motion to compel arbitration, Case No. 2:20-cv-06197 (4 pgs), #28 Exhibit Ex. 28 -10/28/20 email chain re BMW NA's intended motion to transfer and consolidate, Case No. 20STCV07734 and 20CV371358 (8 pgs))(Ihara, Karyn)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLCS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS #25 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court hereby orders that: (1) the hearing on Defendant's Motion is continued to 1/4/2021; (2) Plaintiffs' opposition is due by December 8, 2020; (3) Defendant's reply is due by December 21, 2020; and (4) Discovery is stayed until the Court issues a final ruling on Defendant's Motion. (et)
November 24, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Re Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay all Proceedings from December 21, 2020 to January 4, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Sogoyan ISO Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
November 24, 2020 Filing 24 DENIED NO SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE by Judge John F. Walter, Joint STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, or in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay All Proceedings from December 21, 2020 to January 4, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 is DENIED. (et)
November 24, 2020 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, or in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay All Proceedings from December 21, 2020 to January 4, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: EXHIBITS by Judge John F. Walter. Although counsel has adequately described the exhibits attached to the Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara (Docket No. 21-1), within the document, counsel has failed to adequately describe those exhibits on the docket. Accordingly, counsel shall re-file the Declaration and include a meaningful description of each exhibit by November 25, 2020. [See document for further details.] (et)
November 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Karyn L. Ihara In Support Of Motion Of Defendant BMW Of North America, LLC For Sanctions, Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Or Stay All Proceedings, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #25 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #26 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #27 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #28 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #29 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Karyn L. Ihara, #30 Declaration Of Lilly Natividad In Support Of Motion Of Defendant BMW Of North America, LLC For Sanctions, Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Or Stay All Proceedings, #31 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lilly Natividad) (Ihara, Karyn) Modified on 12/3/2020 (sr).
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT (Joint) Statement Re Local Rule 7-3 Conference For Motion Of BMW Of North America, LLC To Dismiss, Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Ihara, Karyn)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/17/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 30, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: June 1, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: June 4, 2021. (iv)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 - 6 days, filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.(Ihara, Karyn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Nina Q. Huang, Tony L. Cummins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sogoyan, Gregory)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Karyn L. Ihara re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Ihara, Karyn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC identifying BMW (US) Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Ihara, Karyn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 30, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 16, 2020. (iv)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.(Attorney Karyn L Ihara added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Ihara, Karyn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Sogoyan counsel for Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. Adding Gregory Sogoyan as counsel of record for Nina Q. Huang and Tony L. Cummins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Nina Q. Huang and Tony L. Cummins. (Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Tony L. Cummins(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Nina Q. Huang (pty:pla))(Sogoyan, Gregory)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (esa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang, identifying BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Tony L. Cummins, Nina Q. Huang. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27950766 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Nina Q. Huang, Tony L. Cummins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Tony L. Cummins(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Nina Q. Huang (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nina Q Huang et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony L. Cummins
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Q. Huang
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Karyn L Ihara
Represented By: Lisa R Weddle
Represented By: Betty Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?