Lisa Corson v. Event Farm, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and Event Farm, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08190
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vincent Cox counsel for Defendant Event Farm, Inc.. Adding Vincent Cox as counsel of record for Event Farm, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Event Farm, Inc.. (Attorney Vincent Cox added to party Event Farm, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cox, Vincent)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Order to Show Cause #11 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Event Farm, Inc., identifying Lisa Corson, Plaintiff; Event Farm, Inc., Defendant; MemberSuite, LLC (Parent - owns more than 10% of Event Farm, Inc.). (Sundra, Loralee)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Event Farm, Inc. answer now due 11/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Event Farm, Inc..(Attorney Loralee Sundra added to party Event Farm, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sundra, Loralee)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/20/2020. (vdr)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Event Farm, Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC- Lawyers Incorporating Service c/o Koy Saechoa\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Event Farm, Inc. (lh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, identifying EVENT FARM, INC.. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27981150 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. Event Farm, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Event Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Loralee Sundra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Elina Eteri Kharit
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?