Iris Ruano v. Royal Prestige, et al
Plaintiff: IRIS RUANO
Defendant: HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC, Hy Cite Enterprises, LLC, Hy Cite Corporation, Royal Prestige and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 2:2020cv08218
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court filed by Defendants Hy Cite Corporation, Hy Cite Enterprises, LLC. (Morovati, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant Hy Cite Corporation (Morovati, Christina)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff, Iris Ruano Iris Ruano. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Swanson, Benjamin)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
September 8, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND filed by defendants Hy Cite Corporation, Hy Cite Enterprises, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, p. 63)(esa)
September 8, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hy Cite Corporation, Hy Cite Enterprises, LLC, Royal Prestige, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Iris Ruano. (filed in state court 4/28/20, submitted as document 1, p. 17) (esa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC, identifying IRIS RUANO, HY CITE CORPORATION, HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC, GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Garcia, Edward)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Garcia, Edward)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES, case number 20STCV15798 Receipt No: ACACDC-27986881 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attorney Edward Garcia, Jr added to party HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC(pty:dft))(Garcia, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iris Ruano v. Royal Prestige, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS RUANO
Represented By: Zaneta Conroy
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HY CITE CORPORATION AND HY CITE ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Edward Garcia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy Cite Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Edward Garcia, Jr
Represented By: Christina Y Morovati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy Cite Corporation
Represented By: Edward Garcia, Jr
Represented By: Christina Y Morovati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Prestige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?