Leah Tayaotao v. Henry's Holding LLC
Plaintiff: Leah Tayaotao
Defendant: Henry's Holdings, LLC and DOES 1 to 50
Case Number: 2:2020cv08254
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iva)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Scheduling Conference, is ordered CONTINUED from November 23, 2020 to Friday, December 4, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk shall provide counsel with video conference instructions prior to the scheduled hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-111) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08254 JWH(RAOx). (rn)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/23/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Henry's Holdings, LLC.(Aho, Allen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
September 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Leah Tayaotao in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/10/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Henry's Holdings, LLC, identifying Chubb (Insurance); Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC (managing member); Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc. (managing member of Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC). (Aho, Allen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Henry's Holdings, LLC. (Aho, Allen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV05409 Receipt No: ACACDC-28006510 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Henry's Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Allen Steele Aho added to party Henry's Holdings, LLC(pty:mov))(Aho, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leah Tayaotao v. Henry's Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry's Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allen Steele Aho
Represented By: Richard Gary Somes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Tayaotao
Represented By: Ashley Glynn Soto
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Gibalevich
Represented By: Rachel Fishenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?