Joe Wallace et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marina Haba and Joe Wallace
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08279
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of Arkansas, 4:20-cv-01184 filed 10/6/2020. (iv)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 5 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2949, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to Honorable Kristine G. Baker. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janet L Hickson counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Janet L. Hickson as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Janet L Hickson added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hickson, Janet)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of JPML Conditional Transfer Order filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (lc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request, #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): See Notice of assignment docket no. 5. Henceforth, the Official complete case number is to include initials of the assigned Judge and Magistrate as : 2:20cv08279 ODW (GJSx). Case is no longer before case opening section. Therefore for this time only, Clerk will assist filer and add missing initials to the summons to be issued by separate entry. No response is necessary to this deficiency notice. (lc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace, identifying Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Yuhl, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28018953 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Joe Wallace, Marina Haba. (Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Marina Haba(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Joe Wallace(pty:pla))(Yuhl, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Wallace et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Haba
Represented By: Christopher P Yuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Wallace
Represented By: Christopher P Yuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch
Represented By: Janet L Hickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?