Maria Gutierrez De Paredes v. Walmart Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Maria Gutierrez De Paredes
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv08297
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 , calendared for hearing on November 9, 2020, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY In support of motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $3,520.00 filed by Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of $3,520.00 Anna H. Cronk in Support of Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes' Motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E, #3 Notice of Errata to Declaration of Anna H. Cronk in Support of Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes' Motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $3,520.00)(Cronk, Anna)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephan Choo in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case)(Choo, Stephan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes, identifying Walmart Inc.. (Cronk, Anna)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 . Counsel shall file a Notice of Interested Parties on or before October 19, 2020 or risk the striking of the Motion to Remand. (jre)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Anna H. Cronk in Support of Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes' Motion for Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $3,520.00, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes' Motion for Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $3,520.00, #16 Affidavit Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $3,520.00; Declaration of Anna H. Cronk in Support of Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez de Paredes' Motion; Exhibits A-M; [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Maria Gutierrez de Paredes' Motion) (Cronk, Anna)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
September 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Walmart Inc. (filed in state court 10/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 8)(esa)
September 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Walmart Inc., filed by plaintiff Maria Gutierrez De Paredes. (filed in state court 9/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 2) (esa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Walmart Inc., identifying Walmart Inc.. (Choo, Stephan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Walmart, Inc. filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Choo, Stephan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Choo, Stephan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV32482 Receipt No: ACACDC-28024487 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephan Choo In Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-J) (Attorney Stephan Choo added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Choo, Stephan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Gutierrez De Paredes v. Walmart Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gutierrez De Paredes
Represented By: Anna Helena Sorokin Cronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Stephan Choo
Represented By: N Kathleen Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?