Francisco Garcia v. Los Angeles County et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Garcia
Defendant: Nurse Perez, John Does, Tilton, Los Angeles County, Alex Villanueva, Peralta and Yhamel
Case Number: 2:2020cv08528
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 Supplemental DECLARATION of Francisco Garcia in Support of Motion to Compel Inmate Accounting or MCJ Legal Unit to Send A Certified Copy of His Financial Statement to the Court filed by Plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (es)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint (Dkt. 7) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Plaintiff should file his First Amended Complaint with the docket number assigned to this case (2:20-cv-08528-JVS-KES) within 30 days of the date of this order. (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 (2 of 2) Attach Complaint) (es)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of Motion to Compel Inmate Accounting or MCJ Legal Unit to Send a Certified Copy of Francisco Garcia's Financial Statement to the Court filed by plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (es)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to File A Supplemental Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (es)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order DENYING without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Plaintiff's motion fails to demonstrate that appointment of counsel is appropriate at this time. His complaint lays out the relevant facts clearly and in significant detail. Plaintiff has been able to explain his allegations and what relief he is seeking. Considering the likelihood of his success on the merits (at least, as far as the Court can tell at this early stage in the litigation), Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to his renewing the request at a later date. (See document for details.) (es)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Appointment filed by plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (es)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court,if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (lom)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (esa)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants John Does, Los Angeles County, Peralta, Perez, Tilton, Alex Villanueva(Sheriff Los Angeles County, in individual capacity), Alex Villanueva(Sheriff Los Angeles County, in official capacity), Yhamel pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E Scott, filed by plaintiff Francisco Garcia. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco Garcia v. Los Angeles County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yhamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?