Blonde Beard, Inc. et al v. White Rabbit Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Jessamine, Blonde Beard, Inc. and Blonde Beard, Inc. doing business as Taptree
Defendant: Austin Gavlak, Derek J Sine, Vander Group, White Rabbit Group, Inc., White Rabbit Co, Van Tucker, Vander Holdings, Vander Co. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08589
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV27534, acknowledged on 10/20/2020. (iv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of William Ginn Opposition to Motion for Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #10 filed by Defendants Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. (Ginn, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #10 filed by Defendants Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Ginn, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #7 filed by Defendants Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. (Ginn, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #7 filed by Defendants Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. (Ginn, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #10 filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. (Kassabian, Raffi)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #7 filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. (Kassabian, Raffi)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intention to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. (Kassabian, Raffi)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ginn, William)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Kassabian, Raffi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine, identifying Blonde Beard, Inc. and Jeff Jessamine. (Kassabian, Raffi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #7 filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. (Kassabian, Raffi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Blonde Beard, Inc., Jeff Jessamine. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Kassabian, Raffi)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
September 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Austin Gavlak, Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Jessamine, Blonde Beard, Inc. Filed in State Court on 7/21/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Derek J Sine, Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc., identifying White Rabbit Group, White Rabbit Co., Vander Holdings, Vander Co., Vander Group. (Ginn, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Derek J Sine, Defendants Van Tucker, Vander Co., Vander Group, Vander Holdings, White Rabbit Co, White Rabbit Group, Inc.. (Ginn, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 20stcv27534 Receipt No: ACACDC-28155536 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Vander Group, White Rabbit Co, Vander Co., Van Tucker, Derek J Sine, White Rabbit Group, Inc., Vander Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party Derek J Sine(pty:bkmov), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party Van Tucker(pty:dft), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party Vander Co.(pty:dft), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party Vander Group(pty:dft), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party Vander Holdings(pty:dft), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party White Rabbit Co(pty:dft), Attorney William Rand Ginn added to party White Rabbit Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ginn, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blonde Beard, Inc. et al v. White Rabbit Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Gavlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek J Sine
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vander Group
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Rabbit Group, Inc.
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Rabbit Co
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Tucker
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vander Holdings
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vander Co.
Represented By: William Rand Ginn
Represented By: Vernon E Leverty
Represented By: Patrick R Leverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Jessamine
Represented By: Sareen Bezdikian
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blonde Beard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blonde Beard, Inc. doing business as Taptree
Represented By: Sareen Bezdikian
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?