Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Jessica London, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Defendant: Jessica London, Inc., DOES 1-10 Inclusive and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08624
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/18/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-29049811) filed by Defendant Jessica London, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29049811) #16 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 16 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #17 filed on November 18, 2020. (mrgo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29049811) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ has attorney as Administratively Ineligible. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 18] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29049811) filed by Defendant Jessica London, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/19/2020 (mrgo).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Dasha Chestukhin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica London, Inc., designating Jeffrey A Kobulnick as local counsel. (lom)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dasha Chestukhin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28865700) filed by Defendant Jessica London, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jessica London, Inc. answer now due 11/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jessica London, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey A Kobulnick added to party Jessica London, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Jessica London, Inc. served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Stuckey, Agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Meagle, Colby)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. See document for details. (et)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Complaint 1 there is no signature by attorney. (ghap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jessica London, Inc. (ghap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 9/21/2020, receipt number ACACDC-28172003), filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation.(Meagle, Colby) Modified on 9/23/2020 (ghap).
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FILED as Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying None. (Meagle, Colby) Modified on 9/23/2020 (ghap).
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Meagle, Colby)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Meagle, Colby)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28172003 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Colby Ann Meagle added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Meagle, Colby) Modified on 9/23/2020 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Jessica London, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica London, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Kobulnick
Represented By: Michael A Bernet
Represented By: Joel Schmidt
Represented By: Dasha Chestukhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By: Colby Ann Meagle
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Mark S Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?