Info Up, LLC v. Success for Life, Inc.
Plaintiff: INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company, Info Up Publishing, Inc. and Info Up, LLC
Defendant: SUCCESS FOR LIFE, INC., a California corporation, Monica Main, Monica S. Montes, Monica Schiera-Main, Monica Sue Schiera and Success for Life, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08642
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #16 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel and parties make their appearance. The Court invites counsel and parties to present their oral arguments. Arguments are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #16 set for November 16, 2020 will be held telephonically at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following conference call information: Number: (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 6448503. Counsel are ordered to remain available from 10:00 a.m. - 11:00 a.m. Any tentative ruling the Court may prepare, will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY in opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re to Enjoined Parties from using Trademark #16 filed by Plaintiffs Info Up Publishing, Inc., Info Up, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Malynn ISO of Reply, #2 Exhibit 1 ISO of Todd Malynn's Declaration, #3 Declaration of Jason Deiboldt ISO of Reply)(Malynn, Todd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss Case #23 is continued to January 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #30 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Monica Main, re Objection/Opposition #27 , #26 served on 10/29/2020. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Monica Main, re Memorandum #24 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 , Declaration #25 served on 11/4/2020. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 27 DEFENDANT, MONICA MAIN'S AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 filed by Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 DEFENDANT, MONICA MAIN'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT, MONICA MAIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE Re: Motion #23 filed by Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 DEFENDANT, MONICA MAIN'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 DEFENDANT, MONICA MAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) AND TO STRIKE UNDER RULE 12(F) filed by Defendant Monica Main. Motion set for hearing on 1/2/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Info Up Publishing, Inc., Info Up, LLC, upon Defendant Monica Main served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Monica Main, aka Monica Schiera-Main, Monica Sue Schiera and Monica S. Montes in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Malynn, Todd)
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #15 as to Defendant Monica Main. (iv)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Info Up Publishing, Inc., Info Up, LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re to Enjoined Parties from using Trademark #16 served on October 15, 2020. (Malynn, Todd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Plaintiffs Info Up Publishing, Inc., Info Up, LLC. (Malynn, Todd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #17 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the First Amended Complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the First Amended Complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Plaintiff Info Up Publishing, Inc., Info Up, LLC. (Malynn, Todd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re to Enjoined Parties from using Trademark filed by Plaintiff Info Up, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ISO Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Of Jason Deiboldt, #3 Declaration Of Todd Malynn, #4 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Todd Malynn, #5 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Todd Malynn, #6 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Todd Malynn, #7 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Malynn, Todd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Success for Life, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Info Up, LLC(Malynn, Todd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Info Up, LLC. (Malynn, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Success for Life, Inc. (iv)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Info Up, LLC. (Malynn, Todd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Nichols counsel for Plaintiff Info Up, LLC. Stephen M. Nichols is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Nichols, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Info Up, LLC. (Malynn, Todd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd Matthew Malynn on behalf of Plaintiff Info Up, LLC (Malynn, Todd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Info Up, LLC, identifying Undercover Media NV L.L.C., member and owner of Plaintiff; RC Publishing, Inc., member and owner of Undercover Media NV L.L.C.; and Jay Deiboldt. (Attorney Todd Matthew Malynn added to party Info Up, LLC(pty:pla))(Malynn, Todd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Nichols counsel for Plaintiff Info Up, LLC. Stephen M. Nichols is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Nichols, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed under a separate event, not as an attachment to the complaint. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28175635 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Stephen M Nichols added to party INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company(pty:pla))(Nichols, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Info Up, LLC v. Success for Life, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INFO UP, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Info Up Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Matthew Malynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Info Up, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Todd Matthew Malynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUCCESS FOR LIFE, INC., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica S. Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Schiera-Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Sue Schiera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success for Life, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?