Craig Cunningham v. Cinch Home Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Edata By Design, Inc., Cinch Home Services, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Case Number: 2:2020cv08875
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney David J Fioccola APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc., designating Nancy R Thomas as local counsel. (jp)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Fioccola to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28925900) filed by Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Thomas, Nancy)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is GRANTED, and Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc., shall respond to the Complaint on or before 1/18/2021. (jp)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David J Fioccola. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2021 filed by Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Fioccola In Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Attorney Nancy R Thomas added to party Cinch Home Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Thomas, Nancy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. as to Edata By Design, Inc.. (Friedman, Todd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham, upon Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc. served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Krystie Parker-Corporate Creations Network Inc in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Friedman, Todd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court&s Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Edata By Design, Inc. (car)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cinch Home Services, Inc. (car)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham, (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Friedman, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28274107 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Craig Cunningham(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Cunningham v. Cinch Home Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edata By Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinch Home Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy R. Thomas
Represented By: David J. Fioccola
Represented By: Alison Elizabeth Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?