Golden State Water Company v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Golden State Water Company
Defendant: EI Dupont De Numours and Company, John Does, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, The Chemours Company, Corteva Inc, 3M Company, John Doe Defendants and Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08897
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefing as to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc #37 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, The Chemours Company (FRCP RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)) #40 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #36 filed by defendant EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapp, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE (Proposed) Order Granting Defendants The Chemours Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., and DuPont de Nemours, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by defendant EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Rapp, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc #37 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, The Chemours Company (FRCP RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)) #40 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #36 PURUSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Defendant EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Rapp, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and the Chemours Company's Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company's Joint Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure)(Rapp, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, The Chemours Company (FRCP RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)) filed by defendant EI Dupont De Numours and Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Rapp, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant DuPont de Nemours, Inc (Murphy, Paul)
November 20, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Corteva Inc (Murphy, Paul)
November 20, 2020 Filing 37 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc filed by Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Paul)
November 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company filed by defendant 3M Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney John Nadolenco added to party 3M Company(pty:dft)) (Nadolenco, John)
November 20, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant 3M Company (Nadolenco, John)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Connor E. Phalon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, designating Andrew T. Mortl as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Nathan C. Howe APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, designating Andrew T. Mortl as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Lanny S. Kurzweil APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, designating Andrew T. Mortl as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney John J. McAleese APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, designating Andrew T. Mortl as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Natalie S. Watson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, designating Andrew T. Mortl as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Connor E. Phalon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28983919) filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company identifying Corteva, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF THE CHEMOURS COMPANY filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Natalie S. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28981336) filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John J. McAleese III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28981057) filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny S. Kurzweil to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28980795) filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan C. Howe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28979792) filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Mortl, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew T Mortl counsel for Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. Adding Andrew T. Mortl as counsel of record for E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. (Mortl, Andrew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company, re Transfer Pursuant to GO 19-03 DECLINED- (related case)(CV-34) #10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 served on 10/8/2020 and 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 10/8/20 Proof of Service POS on CHEMOURS COMPANY of Orders re transfer and new case, #2 10/8/20 Proof of Service on CORTEVA, INC. of Orders re transfer and new case, #3 10/8/20 Proof of Service on DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC of Orders re transfer and new case, #4 10/9/20 Proof of Service on E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY of Orders re transfer and new case)(Sansone, Kenneth)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Corteva Inc served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; DuPont de Nemours, Inc served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; EI Dupont De Numours and Company served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; The Chemours Company served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 3M Company, Chemours Company, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc. and E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Defendant Chemours Company, #2 Proof of Service on Defendant Corteva Inc., #3 Proof of Service on Defendant DuPont De Nemours, Inc., #4 Proof of Service on Defendant E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company)(Sansone, Kenneth)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to EI Dupont De Numours and Company answer now due 11/20/2020; The Chemours Company answer now due 11/20/2020; 3M Company answer now due 11/20/2020; Corteva Inc answer now due 11/20/2020; DuPont de Nemours, Inc answer now due 11/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants EI Dupont De Numours and Company; The Chemours Company.(Attorney Adam M Rapp added to party EI Dupont De Numours and Company(pty:dft), Attorney Adam M Rapp added to party The Chemours Company(pty:dft))(Rapp, Adam)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489928) #13 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katharine A. Roin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489969) #14 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L.I. Hacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489866) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing. (Thrasher, Lupe)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Katharine A. Roin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc and for EI Dupont De Numours and Company, designating Paul D Murphy as local counsel. (lom)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney John S. Phillips APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc and for EI Dupont De Numours and Company, designating Paul D Murphy as local counsel. (lom)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L.I. Hacker APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc and for E.I. Dupont De Numours and Company, designating Paul D Murphy as local counsel. (lom)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katharine A. Roin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489969) filed by Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear iin a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Murphy, Paul)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489928) filed by Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Murphy, Paul)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine L.I. Hacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28489866) filed by Defendants Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Corteva Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party DuPont de Nemours, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party EI Dupont De Numours and Company(pty:dft)) (Murphy, Paul)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx) (rn)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants 3M Company, Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours, Inc, EI Dupont De Numours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2) (esa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. per L.R. 83-1.4 Related Case(s): Multiple (Mansergh, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08199 (Mansergh, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company, identifying American States Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment #1 to Summons, #2 Exhibit Attachment #2 to Summons)(Mansergh, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28280078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plainitff Golden State Water Company. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Golden State Water Company(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden State Water Company v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI Dupont De Numours and Company
Represented By: John J. McAleese
Represented By: Connor E. Phalon
Represented By: Natalie S. Watson
Represented By: Lanny S. Kurzweil
Represented By: Katharine A. Roin
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Represented By: Nathan C. Howe
Represented By: John S. Phillips
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Represented By: Katherine L. I. Hacker
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont de Nemours, Inc
Represented By: Katharine A. Roin
Represented By: John S. Phillips
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Represented By: Katherine L. I. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: John J. McAleese
Represented By: Connor E. Phalon
Represented By: Natalie S. Watson
Represented By: Lanny S. Kurzweil
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Represented By: Nathan C. Howe
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Katharine A. Roin
Represented By: John S. Phillips
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Represented By: Katherine L. I. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Water Company
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Andrew Walls Homer
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?