Juan Rendon v. Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Rendon
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, Doe, Does 2-100, Inclusive and Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv08964
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand #15 is taken off the 12/3/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 12/3/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Juan Rendon. (Malek, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to California #15 filed by Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daniel Hurwitz in support of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hurwitz, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon, (Malek, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon, (Malek, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to California filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Malek, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Amended MOTION #13 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Judge Olguin only hears civil motions on Thursdays. Counsel must make themselves familiar with the court's procedures and Local Rules. (vdr)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 *STRICKEN* Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Hearing Date filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Malek, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/2/2020 (vdr).
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon. (Malek, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to California #8 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by Refer to L.R. 7-4 Motion. Hearing information missing. Hearing information MISSING, left blank and and therefore filer bypassed scheduling screen and therefore NO motion hearing set on Judge's calendar. (lc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to California #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Hearing information MISSING, left blank and and therefore filer bypassed scheduling screen and therefore NO motion hearing set on Judge's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon, identifying Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Malek, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 (STRICKEN PER 10/30/2020 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE, DOCKET NO. 11). NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to California filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon. (Malek, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/30/2020 (lc).
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-08964 FMO(MRWx). (rn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by Juan Rendon Juan Rendon. (Malek, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
September 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Marathon Petroleum Corporation without prejudice filed by plaintiff Juan Rendon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
September 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
September 30, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Juan Rendon, upon Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Daniel S Hurwitz, Attorney for defendant on behalf Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 30, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC., filed by plaintiff Juan Rendon. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
September 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, Inclusive, Marathon Petroleum Corporation., filed by plaintiff Juan Rendon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, identifying Western Refining Southwest, Inc., and Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Hurwitz, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Hurwitz, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV16439 Receipt No: ACACDC-28316865 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaratrion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration) (Attorney Daniel Scott Hurwitz added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Rendon v. Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rendon
Represented By: Jeffrey L Malek
Represented By: Laura L Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?