Federal Insurance Company v. Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Best Cost Trucking, LLC, Landstar Global Logistics Inc, Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc., Kintetsu World Express (U.S.A.), Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Petitioner: Kintetsu World Express (USA) Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv08967
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 24 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-8967 JVS (PDx). (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kintetsu World Express (U.S.A.), Inc., (Cammarano, Dennis)
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 , CROSSCLAIM against Best Cost Trucking, LLC, Landstar Global Logistics Inc filed by Defendant Kintetsu World Express (U.S.A.), Inc..(Attorney Dennis A Cammarano added to party Kintetsu World Express (U.S.A.), Inc.(pty:dft))(Cammarano, Dennis)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Landstar Global Logistics Inc, (Garfinkel, Gregg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Landstar Global Logistics Inc.(Attorney Gregg S Garfinkel added to party Landstar Global Logistics Inc(pty:dft))(Garfinkel, Gregg)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Kintetsu World Express (USA) Inc. re Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 (vm)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Best Cost Trucking, LLC, Does, Landstar Global Logistics Inc, Kintetsu World Express (USA) Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Berens, Philip)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Federal Insurance Company, upon Defendant Best Cost Trucking, LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Raffi Harutyunyan, Agent for Service. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Berens, Philip)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, upon Defendant Landstar Global Logistics Inc served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, AGENTS FOR SERVICE by leaving with ALBERT DAMONTE, PROCESS SPECIALIST in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Berens, Philip)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, upon Defendant Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sonny Saito, Branch Manager/Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Berens, Philip)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Landstar Global Logistics Inc. (esa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (esa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Best Cost Trucking, LLC. (esa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, (Berens, Philip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Berens, Philip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28323483 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attorney Philip Joseph Berens added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Berens, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Cost Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Global Logistics Inc
Represented By: Gregg S Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetsu Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kintetsu World Express (U.S.A.), Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip Joseph Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kintetsu World Express (USA) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?