Omar Anas v. Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC
Plaintiff: Omar Anas
Defendant: Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC
Petitioner: Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy
Case Number: 2:2020cv08970
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 is granted, and the hearing on defendant's Motion, current set for November 12, 2020, is hereby vacated. If plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted until November 23, 2020, to file a first amended complaint. (iv)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #9 is taken off the 11/12/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 11/12/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. On the court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss #9 is advanced to be heard on 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-08970 FMO(RAOx). (rn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC. (Helmer, Leslie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie A. Gladstone, #2 Exhibit A to Gladstone Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Julie Gladstone added to party Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC(pty:dft)) (Gladstone, Julie)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #7 served on October 1, 2020. (Helmer, Leslie)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on October 1, 2020. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Omar Anas. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy. Related Case(s): None (Helmer, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy, identifying Walgreen Co.. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy identifying Walgreen Co. as Corporate Parent. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV32331 Receipt No: ACACDC-28316269 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Declaration), #9 Exhibit 9) (Attorney Leslie Hecht Helmer added to party Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy(pty:bkmov))(Helmer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omar Anas v. Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Anas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walgreens Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, erroneously sued as Walgreens Pharmacy
Represented By: Leslie Hecht Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Julie Gladstone
Represented By: Leslie Hecht Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?