Alvin Waldo Whisenton v. Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service IRS
Plaintiff: Alvin Waldo Whisenton
Defendant: Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (IRS) and Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service IRS
Case Number: 2:2020cv09043
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER RE:MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #6 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: To date, no opposition has been filed. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set for November 23, 2020. Accordingly, the Court deems Plaintiffs failure to file an opposition as consent to the granting of Defendants Motion. The Court therefore GRANTS the Motion without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details)( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Proposed Order filed by Defendant Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service IRS. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09043 VAP(AFMx). (rn)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
October 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGEMENT filed by plaintiff Alvin Waldo Whisenton. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (IRS). (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20LBCP00172 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (IRS). (Attachments: #1 State Court Record) (Attorney Jeremy L Burkhardt added to party Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (IRS)(pty:dft))(Burkhardt, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvin Waldo Whisenton v. Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Waldo Whisenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Represented By: Jeremy L Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service IRS
Represented By: Jeremy L Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?