Andrew Parker et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Parker and Jasmine Leese
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv09079
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
October 2, 2020 Filing 24 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 9/30/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-01023-BAS-MDD from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*.*350 W. First St.**Los Angeles, CA 90012* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2814 Transfer Order dtd 10.2.2020) (jdt) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #18 ). Case stayed. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation as to whether to include this case in the MDL. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/28/20. (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference. The Court finds good cause to vacate the ENE/CMC pending a ruling on the Motion to Stay or if the case is ordered transferred. If the Motion to Stay is denied the parties must contact the Court within five (5) days to reschedule the ENE/CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 07/27/2020. (no document attached) (atk) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company. (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ford Motor Company re #15 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 filed by Ford Motor Company . (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #15 ** MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Arielle E. Brown, #3 Exhibit A-Joint Stipulation, #4 Exhibit B-JPML Order, #5 Exhibit C-List of Cases in MDL 2814, #6 Exhibit D-CTO 51, #7 Exhibit E-Opp to CTO 51, #8 Exhibit F-Briefing Schedule, #9 Proposed Order)(Brown, Arielle)**QC mailer sent re improper motion (no hrg date). Instructed to withdraw and refile per chambers.(jmo) Modified on 7/27/2020 to withdraw document and term motion (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arielle E. Brown on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Brown, Arielle)Attorney Arielle E. Brown added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 08/04/2020 at 9:30AM. (atk) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/2/20.(jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibits B, C, D, E, H, I, J, L, M (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M)(Hugret, Spencer) *QC Mailer re: improper caption (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ford Motor Company of case(s) 2814-AB Notice of Related Cases. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Hailey Rogerson by Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY MACLEAR by Amy Maclear on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Maclear, Amy)Attorney Amy Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Spencer P. Hugret by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Carlo Cagliata on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Cagliata, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Daghighian, Sepehr)Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Rosenstein, Michael) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-0005423-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13958670.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration fo Spencer P. Hugret, #5 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1023-BAS-MDD. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Parker et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Arielle E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Parker
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Carlo Cagliata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Leese
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Carlo Cagliata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?