Walter Wooten v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Wooten
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive and Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv09190
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Transfer #10 is taken off the 12/10/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 12/10/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Walter Wooten.. (Tang, Theodore)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana (South Bend, IN) #10 filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attorney James Robertson added to party Thor Motor Coach, Inc.(pty:dft))(Robertson, James)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana (South Bend, IN) #10 filed by Plaintiff Walter Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Theodore Tang, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Theodore Tang, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Theodore Tang)(Tang, Theodore)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana (South Bend, IN) filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of Dolores E. Gonzales in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Declaration of Mark Stanley in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #4 Appendix of Lodgment in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #5 Exhibit A: Retail Installment Sales Contract, #6 Exhibit B: Warranty Guide, #7 Exhibit C: Plaintiff's State Court Action First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit D: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action, #9 Exhibit E: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit F: [Proposed] Order) (Gonzales, Dolores)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Gonzales, Dolores)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Walter Wooten.. (Starr, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc., identifying None. (Gonzales, Dolores)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Gonzales, Dolores)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura Superior Court, case number 56-2020-00544997-CU-BC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-28425910 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's State Court Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff's State Court Action Summons-POS (Thor), #3 Exhibit C: Plaintiff's State Court Action First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D: Retail Installment Sales Contract, #5 Exhibit E: Notice of Removal to State Court, #6 Exhibit F: Notice of Removal to Plaintiff) (Attorney Dolores E Gonzales added to party Thor Motor Coach, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gonzales, Dolores)
October 7, 2020 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Walter Wooten in Ventura Superior Court on 9/3/2020, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walter Wooten v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Wooten
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Theodore Richard Tang
Represented By: Robert L Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Dolores E Gonzales
Represented By: James Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?