Daniel O'Connor v. Warner Bros Animation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Connor
Defendant: Warner Bros Animation Inc., Does 1 through 100 and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv09291
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER REMOVING ACTION FROM THE ACTIVE LIST OF CASES PURSUANT TO STAY. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report concerning the arbitration proceedings #27 . The Court orders the Clerk to remove this case from the Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action, and this Order shall not prejudice any partyto this action. The Court's order requiring the parties to file status reports and notify the Court of the conclusion of arbitration proceedings remains in effect #6 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
May 21, 2021 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re Arbitration filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #12 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #18 . The Court grants the parties' motions to compel arbitration and denies without prejudice Defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties are ordered to submit this action to arbitration within 30 days pursuant to the terms of the arbitration agreements. The case is stayed pending resolution of the arbitration. To the extent Defendant argues that certain claims are not arbitrable or must be dismissed, the Court denies Defendants motion without prejudice to renewing these arguments before the arbitrator. The parties shall file a joint status report within 120 days, and a further report every 120 days thereafter. Each report must state on the cover page the date the next report is due. Additionally, the parties must notify the Court within seven days of the conclusion of arbitration proceedings. (lc)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc. (ECF No. #12 ) and the Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff #18 and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matters can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the motions, noticed for hearing on January 25, 2021, have been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #18 filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)(Van Vleck, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of Plaintiff O'Connor's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #18 filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. (Van Vleck, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. (Van Vleck, Brian)
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #18 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 Opposition Support re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #18 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Brian Van Vleck, #2 Proposed Order Granting Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Brian Van Vleck, #3 Declaration of Bobbie Page and Exhibits G and H, #4 Declaration of Jane Lee, #5 Declaration of Emma Luevano and Exhibits F and I)(Luevano, Emma)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian F. Van Vleck) (Van Vleck, Brian)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. On the Courts own motion, the briefing schedule is extended to comport with Local Rules 7-9 and 7-10. Plaintiffs opposition brief is due January 4, 2021, and any reply thereto is due January 11, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DENIED ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi, re Stipulation to Continue #15 . DENIED by Order of the Court. (smo)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel the Rest of Plaintiff's Complaint to Individual Arbitration from January 25, 2021 to March 26, 2021 filed by plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Kluft, #2 Proposed Order Granting Continuance and Granting Briefing Schedule)(Van Vleck, Brian)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jane Lee, #2 Declaration Bobbie Page and Exhibits G and H, #3 Declaration Emma Luevano and Exhibit F) (Luevano, Emma)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Louise Truong counsel for Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. Adding Louise Truong as counsel of record for Warner Bros. Animation Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Attorney Louise Truong added to party Warner Bros Animation Inc.(pty:dft))(Truong, Louise)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AND SERVICE OF THIS ORDER ON ALL PARTIES BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT IF CASE CAME TO THE COURT AS A PETITION FOR REMOVAL) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc..(Luevano, Emma)
October 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/27/2020, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jane Lee re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Emma Luevano re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc., identifying Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. and AT&T. (Luevano, Emma)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV33069 Receipt No: ACACDC-28465883 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of Assignment, #4 Summons, #5 Minute Order, #6 Certificate of Mailing) (Attorney Emma Luevano added to party Warner Bros Animation Inc.(pty:dft))(Luevano, Emma)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Warner Bros Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel O'Connor v. Warner Bros Animation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Connor
Represented By: Stuart Harris Kluft
Represented By: Brian F Van Vleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros Animation Inc.
Represented By: Emma Luevano
Represented By: Louise Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?