Eugene Martindale, III v. City of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: EUGENE MARTINDALE, III
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10, 7-ELEVEN, OFFICER BRAULIO IGNAC CARBAJAL, OFFICER JOEL CHRISTOPH JOHNSON, OFFICER FELICIANO REYES, JR, OFFICER JOSEPH JOHN CALISE, TODD ANTHONY THORNTON, CITY OF LONG BEACH, Does 1-10, Inclusive and Officier Feliciano Reyes, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv09385
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS 7-Eleven, Joseph John Calise, Braulio Ignac Carbajal, City of Long Beach, Does, Joel Christoph Johnson, Feliciano Reyes, Jr, Todd Anthony Thornton amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III(Diggs, Rodney)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #23 . Plaintiff will file a First Amended Complaint by December 1, 2020. Defendants will meet and confer regarding any motions, if necessary, by December 10, 2020. Defendants will file a responsive pleading by December 18, 2020. (twdb)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File File Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diggs, Rodney)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING #21 by Judge Christina A. Snyder as follows: Plaintiff will fie a First Amended Complaint by 12/1/2020. Defendants will meet and confer regarding any motions, if necessary, by 12/10/2020. Defendants will file a responsive pleading by 12/18/2020. (jp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File File Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diggs, Rodney)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Todd Anthony Thornton. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 7-Eleven. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Feliciano Reyes, Jr. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Braulio Ignac Carbajal. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Joel Christoph Johnson. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Joseph John Calise. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Long Beach. (shb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Martindale, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff EUGENE MARTINDALE, III, identifying CITY OF LONG BEACH, OFFICER JOSEPH JOHN CALISE, OFFICER JOEL CHRISTOPH JOHNSON, OFFICER BRAULIO IGNAC CARBAJAL, OFFICER FELICIANO REYES, JR., 7-ELEVEN, TODD ANTHONY THORNTON and DOES 1-10, Inclusive. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EUGENE MARTINDALE, III. (Diggs, Rodney)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28510612 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff EUGENE MARTINDALE, III. (Attorney Rodney S Diggs added to party EUGENE MARTINDALE, III(pty:pla))(Diggs, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugene Martindale, III v. City of Long Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-ELEVEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER BRAULIO IGNAC CARBAJAL
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOEL CHRISTOPH JOHNSON
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER FELICIANO REYES, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOSEPH JOHN CALISE
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ANTHONY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LONG BEACH
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officier Feliciano Reyes, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE MARTINDALE, III
Represented By: Rodney S Diggs
Represented By: Antonio K Kizzie
Represented By: Yalda Paydar
Represented By: May Mallari
Represented By: Tonette J Jaramilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?