Paul O. Paradis v. Ellen Pansky et al
Plaintiff: Paul O. Paridis and Paul O. Paradis
Defendant: Maribeth Annaguey, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law, Ellen Pansky, Brown George Ross LLP, ERIC M. GEORGE, Browne George Ross LLP and Defendants Does
Case Number: 2:2020cv09660
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Virginia A Phillips
3 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, re Order on Motion for Order, #51 served on March 23, 2021. (Nicholson, Guy)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP, ERIC M. GEORGE, AND MARIBETH ANNAGUEY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #47 EX PARTE APPLICATION: Note: Changes made by the Court. (bm)
March 19, 2021 Filing 50 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Pro Se Plaintiff to Serve Opposition to Motions by Electronic Mail #47 filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mitchell F. Mulbarger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Mitchell F. Mulbarger, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Mitchell F. Mulbarger)(Mulbarger, Mitchell)
March 19, 2021 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mitchell F Mulbarger counsel for Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. Adding Mitchell F. Mulbarger as counsel of record for Ellen Pansky and Pansky Markle Attorneys at Law for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky and Pansky Markle Attorneys at Law. (Attorney Mitchell F Mulbarger added to party Ellen Pansky(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell F Mulbarger added to party Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law(pty:dft))(Mulbarger, Mitchell)
March 18, 2021 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Pro Se Plaintiff to Serve Opposition to Motions by Electronic Mail #47 served on 3/18/2021. (Nicholson, Guy)
March 18, 2021 Filing 47 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Pro Se Plaintiff to Serve Opposition to Motions by Electronic Mail filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Guy C. Nicholson in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Guy Nicholson, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Guy Nicholson, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Guy Nicholson, #5 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Require Pro Se Plaintiff to Serve Opposition to Motions by Electronic Mail) (Nicholson, Guy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 46 Proof of Service re: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #44 (Zeldin, Kim)
March 8, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kim S Zeldin counsel for Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George. Adding Kim S. Zeldin as counsel of record for Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George and Maribeth Annaguey for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George and Maribeth Annaguey. (Attorney Kim S Zeldin added to party Maribeth Annaguey(pty:dft), Attorney Kim S Zeldin added to party Browne George Ross LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Kim S Zeldin added to party Eric M. George(pty:dft))(Zeldin, Kim)
March 8, 2021 Filing 44 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law, identifying Ellen Pansky and Pansky Markle Attorneys at Law. (Baker, Phillip)
March 8, 2021 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(5) #39 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Corrected Complaint Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #5 #42 filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Phillip)
March 8, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Corrected Complaint Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Baker, Phillip)
March 8, 2021 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 425.16; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #38 served on March 8, 2021. (Nicholson, Guy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 425.16; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #38 filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 9 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit 10 to Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit 11 to Request for Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit 12 to Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit 13 to Request for Judicial Notice, #14 Exhibit 14 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Nicholson, Guy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(5) filed by Defendants Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Ellen Pansky, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party Ellen Pansky(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip A Baker added to party Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law(pty:dft)) (Baker, Phillip)
March 8, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 425.16; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Strike) (Nicholson, Guy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Eric M. George, identifying BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP, ERIC M. GEORGE AND MARIBETH ANNAGUEY. (Nicholson, Guy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Maribeth Annaguey, Browne George Ross LLP, Defendants Does, Eric M. George, Ellen Pansky, Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Request for Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Request for Judicial Notice, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Request for Judicial Notice, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Request for Judicial Notice, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Declaration of Maribeth Annaguey In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #18 Declaration of Eric M. George In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #19 Declaration of Francisco Cuellar In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #20 Exhibit A to the Francisco Cuellar In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #21 Exhibit B to the Francisco Cuellar In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #22 Declaration of Kim S. Zeldin In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #23 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #24 Supplement Proof of Service re Motion to Dismiss and Accompanying Documents) (Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Maribeth Annaguey(pty:dft), Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Browne George Ross LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Defendants Does(pty:dft), Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Eric M. George(pty:dft), Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Ellen Pansky(pty:dft), Attorney Guy C Nicholson added to party Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law(pty:dft)) (Nicholson, Guy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis, upon Defendant Eric M. George served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Francisco Queller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis, upon Defendant Maribeth Annaguey served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Francisco Queller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis, upon Plaintiff Browne George Ross LLP served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Francisco Queller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis, upon Defendant Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SIDNEY SANCHEZ, person authorized to accept such service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/16/2021. (cch)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-06661 VAP(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09660 VAP(JCx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #16 by Judge John F. Walter. The request of Paul Paradis to substitute pro se instead of Gregory Smith, Diana Wells, Leila Al Faiz is GRANTED. (iv)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09660 JFW (PVCx). (esa)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09660 RSWL(PVCx). (rn)
October 29, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law. (shb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Maribeth Annaguey. (shb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Ellen Pansky. (shb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Eric M. George. (shb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Eric M. George. (shb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #5 as to Defendant Browne George Ross LLP. (shb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Paul O. Paradis, Pro Se Plaintiff in place of attorney Gregory W. Smith, Diana Wang Wells, Leila K. Al Faiz/Law Offices of Gregory W. Smith Proposed Order on Request to Substitute Attorney filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution) (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis, (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #5 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paradis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paridis(Smith, Gregory)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attorney did not sign the complaint. Please correct the deficiency and re-file an amended signed complaint using the appropriate docketing event. (lh)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paridis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paridis. (Smith, Gregory)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28642913 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Paul O. Paridis. (Attorney Gregory W Smith added to party Paul O. Paridis(pty:pla))(Smith, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul O. Paradis v. Ellen Pansky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maribeth Annaguey
Represented By: Kim S Zeldin
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pansky Markel Attorneys at Law
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Mitchell F Mulbarger
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Pansky
Represented By: Phillip A Baker
Represented By: Mitchell F Mulbarger
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown George Ross LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC M. GEORGE
Represented By: Kim S Zeldin
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browne George Ross LLP
Represented By: Kim S Zeldin
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants Does
Represented By: Guy C Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul O. Paridis
Represented By: Gregory W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul O. Paradis
Represented By: Gregory W Smith
Represented By: Diana Wang Wells
Represented By: Leila K Al Faiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?