William Robert Norrie v. John O'Gorman
Plaintiff: William Robert Norrie
Defendant: John O'Gorman
Case Number: 2:2020cv09860
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS filed by Plaintiff William Robert Norrie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (iv)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. [SEE ATTACHMENT OF THIS ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (et)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09860-MWF-RAOx. (aco)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant John O'Gorman. (dml)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff William Robert Norrie. (esa)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant John O'Gorman.Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff William Robert Norrie. (Attachments: #1 CV 71, #2 summons req) (esa) Modified on 10/30/2020 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Robert Norrie v. John O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Robert Norrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?