Antonio Fernandez v. Henry Rose et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Henry Rose, Sara Rose, Gurmail Singh and Gurpreet Singh
Case Number: 2:2020cv09959
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Gurmail Singh served on 11/26/2020, answer due 12/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gurpreet Singh -co occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a Notice of Settlement on 11/18/2020 #13 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are to show cause why the action should not be dismissed with prejudice on 1/11/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. If the parties file a proposed order to dismiss the entire action with prejudice by 1/4/2021, the OSC shall be taken off calendar without further notice. Otherwise, the parties shall appear at the OSC hearing, and the Court shall set a trial date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other hearings and deadlines are vacated. (gk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Notice of Settlement #13 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Vacate All Currently Set Dates filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. upon Henry Rose(representative capacity as Trustee of The Henry and Sara Rose Family Trust dated January 28, 1993) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Henry Rose(in individual) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Dr. Yvette Rose. (Seabock, Amanda)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. upon Sara Rose(in individual) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Sara Rose(representative capacity as Trustee of The Henry and Sara Rose Family Trust dated January 28, 1993) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Dr. Yvette Rose. (Seabock, Amanda)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-09959 SB(PDx). (rn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTIAL ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sp)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Henry Rose(representative capacity as Trustee of The Henry and Sara Rose Family Trust dated January 28, 1993), Henry Rose(in individual), Sara Rose(in individual), Sara Rose(representative capacity as Trustee of The Henry and Sara Rose Family Trust dated January 28, 1993), Gurmail Singh, Gurpreet Singh. (ghap)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28760489 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Henry Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurmail Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?