Patrick Allen Cannavan v. County of Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Allen Cannavan
Defendant: Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub, DOES 1-10, inclusive and County of Ventura
Case Number: 2:2020cv10012
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David S McLane counsel for Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. Changing Firm Name to McLane, Bednarski & Litt, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (McLane, David)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub.(Gardner, Emily)
November 4, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION OF ASSISTANT SHERIFF ERIC DOWD re Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gardner, Emily)
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION OF ASSISTANT SHERIFF ERIC DOWD re Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (Gardner, Emily)
November 3, 2020 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #25 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Allen Cannavan. (McLane, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO INFORM ELIGIBLE VOTERS NOT JUST REGISTERED VOTERS AND PROVIDE BALLOTS TO ELIGIBLE VOTERS IN ADDITION TO REGISTERED VOTERS filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (Gardner, Emily)
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS TO COUNTYS RESPONSE TO TRO, AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO INFORM ELIGIBLE VOTERS NOT JUST REGISTERED VOTERS AND PROVIDE BALLOTS TO ELIGIBLE VOTERS IN ADDITION TO REGISTERED VOTERS re: Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLane, David)
November 2, 2020 Filing 24 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COURT ORDERS RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF ERIC DOWD re Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Assistant Sheriff Eric Dowd)(Gardner, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Blank document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #18 , #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Declaration (Motion related). Title page with caption and case number missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff is granted a temporary restraining order as set in this order. *See order for ruling and deadlines imposed by court.* (vdr)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order for [Conditional] Class Certification #6 is granted as set forth in this Order. The court provisionally certifies the following class: All inmates housed at Ventura County Jail as of the date of this Order who are eligible to vote and requested ballots, so they can vote in the 11/3/2020 election. The court provisionally appoints Patrick Allen Cannavan as class representative. The court provisionally appoints David S. McLane of Kaye, McLane, Bednarksi & Litt, LLP and Brian A. Vogel of The Law Offices of Brian A. Vogel, P.C. as class counsel. (vdr)
November 1, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT Declaration of Patrick Cannavan in Support of Reply to Opposition Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits I, J and K filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Kites, #2 Exhibit J - Grievance responses, #3 Exhibit K - Voter registration)(Vogel, Brian)
November 1, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit G in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Oppsition to Ex parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Vogel, Brian)
November 1, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class #6 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David S. McLane, #2 Exhibit A to DM Decl., #3 Exhibit B to DM Decl., #4 Exhibit C to DM Decl., #5 Exhibit D to DM Decl., #6 Exhibit E to DM Decl., #7 Exhibit F to DM Decl.)(McLane, David)
October 31, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION in opposition re: Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CECIL ARGUE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PATRICIA SALAS, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER)(Attorney Emily T Gardner added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft), Attorney Emily T Gardner added to party Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub(pty:dft))(Gardner, Emily)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,, #10 served on 10-30-2020. (Vogel, Brian)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Arnold Vogel counsel for Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. Adding Brian A. Vogel as counsel of record for Patrick Cannavan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick Cannavan. (Vogel, Brian)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below. Re: Minute Order (In Chambers) Order Re: Ex Parte Applications #11 . Other: Document #11 is a duplicate of document #10 . Please disregard. (bm)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Breanna Garcia, Sheriff Office Asst. and Lori Key, Deputy Clerk of the Board, County of Ventura in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Vogel, Brian)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED, SEE DOCUMENT #13 , E-FILED ON 10/30/20. MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Re: Ex Parte Applications for Temporary Restraining Order and Class Certification by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (bm) Modified on 10/30/2020 (bm). Modified on 11/1/2020 (vdr).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Order Re: Ex Parte Applications for Temporary Restraining Order and Class CertificationHaving reviewed and considered Patrick Allen Cannavans (plaintiff) Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 5) and Ex Parte Application for Order for Class Certification (Dkt. 6) (collectively, Applications), filed on October 30, 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The County of Ventura and Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub (defendants) shall file their briefs in response to the Applications no later than October 31, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. 2. Plaintiff shall file his reply briefs in support of the Applications no later than November 1, 2020, at 3:00 p.m.3. Defendants shall be prepared to distribute forthwith absentee ballots to the putative class members on the morning of November 2, 2020, in the event that the court grants plaintiffs Applications. 4. Plaintiff shall forthwith serve defendants with a copy of this Order via email and personal service. (lc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants County of Ventura, Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub. (jtil)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLane, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patrick Cannavan, #2 Declaration David McLane, #3 Declaration Brian Vogel, #4 Proposed Order) (McLane, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan, (McLane, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (McLane, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (McLane, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28792725 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Allen Cannavan. (Attorney David S McLane added to party Patrick Allen Cannavan(pty:pla))(McLane, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Allen Cannavan v. County of Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Sheriff Bill Ayub
Represented By: Emily T Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Emily T Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Allen Cannavan
Represented By: Brian Arnold Vogel
Represented By: David S McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?