Hurford Global LLC v. ROM 3 California, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hurford Global LLC
Defendant: ROM3 California, LLC, ROM Technologies, Inc., ROM, Nevada limited liability company, Peter Arn and Sanford A Gomberg
Case Number: 2:2020cv10203
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 89 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 JURY DEMAND. Response to ROM Counterclaim filed by Counterdefendant Hurford Global LLC.(Attorney David Howard Pierce added to party Hurford Global LLC(pty:cd))(Pierce, David)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting #68 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. Green APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global, LLC, designating David H. Pierce as local counsel. (es)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting #67 Non-Resident Attorney Marc C. Goldenberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global, LLC, designating David H. Pierce as local counsel. (es)
December 8, 2020 Filing 86 Third APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/13/2020, Receipt No. 29009790) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 85 Third APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark C Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/13/2020, Receipt No. 29009506) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10203-JVS (PVCx). (aco)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10203-RSWL-PVCx. (aco)
November 24, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application #69 and #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 19, 2020 Filing 81 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc C Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/13/2020, Receipt No. 29009506) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 80 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/13/2020, Receipt No. 29009790) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Y Xie counsel for Defendants Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc.. Adding Robert Y. Xie as counsel of record for ROM Technologies, Inc., Peter Arn, Sanford A. Gomberg for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ROM Technologies, Inc, Peter Arn, Sanford A. Gomberg. (Attorney Robert Y Xie added to party Peter Arn(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Y Xie added to party Sanford A Gomberg(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Y Xie added to party ROM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Xie, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 JURY DEMAND. Answer to First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant ROM Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Feinberg, Ian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 JURY DEMAND. Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Sanford A Gomberg.(Feinberg, Ian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 JURY DEMAND. Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Peter Arn.(Feinberg, Ian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael Edward Harriss on behalf of Defendants Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc., ROM3 California, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 18, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf of Defendants Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc., ROM3 California, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application #69 and #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 17, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29009790) #68 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc C Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29009506) #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #70 , Miscellaneous Document #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order should be an attachment to the application. An amended/corrected application should've been filed, in lieu of using the miscellaneous event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
November 16, 2020 Filing 70 Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pierce, David)
November 16, 2020 Filing 69 Certificate of Good Standing filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC Attorney Marc C Goldenberg (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 68 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29009790) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 67 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc C Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29009506) filed by Plaintiff Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pierce, David)
November 10, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Edward Harriss on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Goldenberg on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Zachary Tyler Shelton on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. Green on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-000484-JPG, from Southern District of Illinois (East St. Louis). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-10203 DDP (PVCx). (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 58 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Illinois Southern
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DENIES Hurford Global's motion to strike the defendants' reply brief (Doc. 52), GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the defendants' motion (Doc.42)and TRANFERS this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the Central District of California to be heard in its Western Division based in Los Angeles. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/3/2020. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 56 Sealed Document Declaration of Dr. Patricia Hurford in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue re #42 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, by Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 55 Sealed Document Plaintiff Hurford Global, LLC's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) re #42 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, by Hurford Global LLC. (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Strike Defendants 'Replyin Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(2) or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc., ROM3 California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File under seal. Court records are presumptively open to the public. Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 568 (7th Cir. 2000). However, a court may seal records to protect trade secrets or other kinds of information deserving of long-term confidentiality. Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 545 (7th Cir. 2002); Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 598 (1978). The material sought to be filed under seal in this case is appropriate to be kept out of the public eye to protect confidential financial and other proprietary business terms which, if disclosed, would create an unwarranted competitive advantage. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the plaintiff shall have seven days to electronically file under seal a copy of its unredacted response to the defendants' #47 motion to dismiss and all its attached exhibits in unredacted form. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2020. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike Defendants 'Replyin Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(2) or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a). by Hurford Global LLC. (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #50 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc. Incorrect case number on document. The correct case number is 3:20-cv-484-JPG. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of C filed by Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc.. (Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Hurford Global LLC. (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 48 EXHIBIT by Hurford Global LLC. Declaration of Dr. Patricia Hurford in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plainiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(2) or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Hurford Global LLC. (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 12/1/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #44 Joint MOTION for Track "C" Assignment filed by Defendants. Final Pretrial Conference is Reset for 12/1/2021 at 9:30 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. The parties are ORDERED to submit an amended joint report and proposed scheduling and discovery order that is in accord with the current trial date of December 13, 2021 to JPGpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/20/2020. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Track "C" Assignment by All Defendants. (Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery due by 3/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 7/7/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 7/19/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) Pursuant to a Mandatory Contractual Forum Selection Clause by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Arn in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 41 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 7/7/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 7/19/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 40 Sealed Document First Amended Complaint by Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed 1, #2 Exhibit Sealed 2)(Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Court records are presumptively open to the public. Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 568 (7th Cir. 2000). However, a court may seal records to protect trade secrets or other kinds of information deserving of long-term confidentiality. Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 545 (7th Cir. 2002); Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 598 (1978). The material sought to be filed under seal in this case is appropriate to be kept out of the public eye to protect confidential financial and other proprietary business terms which, if disclosed, would create an unwarranted competitive advantage. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the plaintiff shall have seven days to electronically file under seal a copy of the unredacted First Amended Complaint attaching all exhibits in unredacted form. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/13/2020. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Hurford Global LLC. (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM Technologies, Inc., filed by Hurford Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (redacted))(Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Green on behalf of Hurford Global LLC (Green, Kevin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Tyler Shelton on behalf of Hurford Global LLC (Shelton, Zachary) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2020. (amv) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisdictional defect. Amended pleading due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/18/2020. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-484-JPG. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Ian N. Feinberg. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROM3 California, LLC. (Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf of Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM3 California, LLC (Heidenreich, Roger) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Harriss on behalf of Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM3 California, LLC (Harriss, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ian N. Feinberg $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4202643 by on behalf of Peter Arn, Sanford A Gomberg, ROM3 California, LLC. (Feinberg, Ian) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sanford A Gomberg waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Pierce, David) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. ROM3 California, LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Pierce, David) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Peter Arn waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Pierce, David) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H. Pierce on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H. Pierce $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4189777 on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pierce, David) Modified on 6/2/2020 (trb). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Peter Arn and original mailed to Attorney Goldenberg. (kdw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to ROM3 California, LLC and original sent to Attorney Goldenberg. (kdw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Sanford A Gomberg and original mailed to Attorney Goldenberg. (kdw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Hurford Global LLC. A Motion for Pro Hac Vice cannot be filed on behalf of another Attorney. Attorney David H. Pierce must first obtain his own login credentials for CM/ECF and then will file his own Motion. Upon re-filing the motion, Attorney Pierce should bypass pay.gov as to not incur an additional fee. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David H. Pierce by Attorney Mark C. Goldenberg $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4189777 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CA Certificate of Standing)(Goldenberg, Mark) Modified on 5/28/2020 (kek). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint Exhibit 1. (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint . (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #3 , #4 , and #5 Summons Requested. The summonses submitted are incomplete and in fillable format. Fillable document should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. Summonses are to be completed with defendants name and address with the listed Plaintiff's Attorney who it must be served. Filer is to re-file the documents. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Hurford Global LLC. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Hurford Global LLC, Reona J. Daly. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-484-RJD. Consent due by 6/17/2020 (kdw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Goldenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Hurford Global LLC. Document includes a clerical error. Filer will re-file. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) Modified on 5/27/2020 (kdw). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) Modified on 5/27/2020 (kdw). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN Summons Requested. (Goldenberg, Mark) Modified on 5/27/2020 (kdw). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Goldenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goldenberg, Mark) Modified on 5/27/2020 (kdw). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4188451.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldenberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 11/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurford Global LLC v. ROM 3 California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROM3 California, LLC
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Michael Edward Harriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROM Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Y Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROM
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Michael Edward Harriss
Represented By: Robert Y Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada limited liability company
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Michael Edward Harriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Arn
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Michael Edward Harriss
Represented By: Robert Y Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford A Gomberg
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: Michael Edward Harriss
Represented By: Robert Y Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurford Global LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Goldenberg
Represented By: David Howard Pierce
Represented By: Zachary Tyler Shelton
Represented By: Kevin P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?