Larry G. Philpot v. Leaf Group Ltd.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: LEAF GROUP LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10264
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-195) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10264 FLA (MAA). (mrgo)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. upon Leaf Group Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Elizabeth L. Schilken, counsel for Leaf Group Ltd.. (McClure, Brett)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (tj)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Leaf Group Ltd. (ghap)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (McClure, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, identifying Leaf Group Ltd.. (McClure, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (McClure, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (McClure, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28926445 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Attorney Brett Linden McClure added to party Larry G. Philpot(pty:pla))(McClure, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry G. Philpot v. Leaf Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Brett Linden McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAF GROUP LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?