Better Mouse Company, LLC v. VTIN Technology Co., Limited
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Defendant: VTIN Technology Company, Limited and VTIN Technology Co., Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv10269
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC) #14 The document is stricken. Counsel to file a new application if appearance still desired. (jre)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in wrong case. Other error(s) with document(s): This is for case 8:20-CV-2166 DOC. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #12 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64), #13 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant VTIN Technology Co., Limited. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28926975 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Steven W. Ritcheson added to party Better Mouse Company, LLC(pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Mouse Company, LLC v. VTIN Technology Co., Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VTIN Technology Company, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VTIN Technology Co., Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven W. Ritcheson
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?