Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. v. Oney Murguia
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Defendant: Oney Murguia
Case Number: 2:2020cv10288
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:20-cv-08427 filed 11/30/2020. (iv)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. On November 11, 2020, the Court ordered Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., as subrogee of Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association, to show cause why the case should not be dismissed or transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California #9 . In response, Plaintiff's counsel submitted a declaration averring that she inadvertently designated the case for filing in the United States District Court for the Central District of California #10 . This Court is not the proper venue for this action. The Court ORDERS that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Entire case electronically transferred to USDC Northern California on 11/24/2020). (lc) Modified on 11/24/2020 (lc).
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Susan M. Benson filed by Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.. (Benson, Susan)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why the action should not be dismissed or transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a). Plaintiff shall respond in writing within 14 days of the date of this Order. (lc)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Oney Murguia. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. a/s/o Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association, identifying Oney Murguia. (Benson, Susan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. a/s/o Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association. (Benson, Susan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. a/s/o Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association. (Benson, Susan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28943568 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. a/s/o Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association. (Attorney Susan M Benson added to party Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. a/s/o Casa Del Valle Homeowners Association(pty:pla))(Benson, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. v. Oney Murguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oney Murguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?