Maria Ocasio v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Ocasio
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Does 1 to 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv10294
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 56-02020-00542675-CU-PO-VTA, acknowledged on 11/24/2020. (iv)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Ventura County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Ventura County Superior Court, No. 56-02020-00542675-CU-PO-VTA. (lc)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REMANDING BACK TO STATE COURT #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : Case remanded to Ventura County Superior Court, Case number 56-02020-00542675-CU-PO-VTA. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Although pdf document cites proposed order, it was missing. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Luna, Silvia)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 8, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.. (ghap)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
November 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF STATE COURT FILE) (ghap)
November 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILE COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, inclusive, Walmart Inc., filed by plaintiff Maria Ocasio. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 PAGE 5 OF DECLARATION OF SILVIA E. LUNA, ESQ.) (ghap)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Luna, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Luna, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Silvia E. Luna re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Luna, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Luna, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL-FILED as REQUEST Receipt No: ACACDC-28947652 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attorney Silvia Elizabeth Luna added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Luna, Silvia) Modified on 11/13/2020 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Ocasio v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Silvia Elizabeth Luna
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ocasio
Represented By: Andrew James Fodo
Represented By: Carl D Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?