Angels Goka v. The Humane Society of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Angela Goka
Defendant: The Humane Society of the United States and DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv10373
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
November 12, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2)(ghap)
November 12, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, Inclusive, The Humane Society of the United States. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Angela Goka. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/7/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States, re Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 served on November 12, 2020. (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States, identifying 1. The Humane Society of the United States Defendant. 2. Angela Goka Plaintiff.. (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lynn Mazin counsel for Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. Adding Chantelle C. Egan as counsel of record for The Humane Society of the United States for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. (Mazin, Amanda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV10373 Receipt No: ACACDC-28986202 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Humane Society of the United States. (Attorney Amanda Lynn Mazin added to party The Humane Society of the United States(pty:dft))(Mazin, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angels Goka v. The Humane Society of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Amanda Lynn Mazin
Represented By: Chantelle C Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Goka
Represented By: Rodney Mesriani
Represented By: Cory David Gould
Represented By: Brandon Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?