Kimball-Griffith, L.P. v. Brenda Wren Burman et al
Petitioner: Kimball-Griffith, L.P.
Respondent: Montecito Water District, Carpinteria Valley Water District, Brenda Wren Burman, Nicola T. Hanna, Scott McGolpin, Does 1-100 and Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board
In Re: United States of America v. 6.03 Acres of Land in the County of Santa Barbara, State of California, et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv10647
Filed: November 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL PETITION/COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #17 , Defendants Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board, Montecito Water District and Carpinteria Valley Water District's response to Plaintiff's initial Petition/Complaint shall be filed on or before 2/9/2021. (gk)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE ANDRE BRIOTTE JUNIOR #10 . (lc)
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner Kimball-Griffith, L.P. for Court Reporter. Court will contact John K. Dorwin at johnkdorwin@gmail.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dorwin, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Petition/Complaint by More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3))(Carter, William)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board, (Carter, William)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Wesley Carter counsel for Respondent Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board. Adding William W. Carter as counsel of record for Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board. (Attorney William Wesley Carter added to party Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board(pty:res))(Carter, William)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Scott McGolpin. upon Scott McGolpin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Callie Patton Kim. (Dorwin, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTES OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGEANDRE BIROTTE, JR. (Dkt. No. #11 )Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The motion hearing is held. The Court states its view that it is inclined to deny Petitioner's Motion to Disqualify Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. #11 (the "Motion"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION. Counsel may withdraw the Motion before December 21, 2020. If counsel does not withdraw the Motion, a ruling will issue on or after December 21, 2020. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (lom)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court, on its own motion, sets a telephonic hearing on the Motion to Disqualify Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. (Dkt. No. #10 ) for December 14, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Call-in instructions will be emailed to everyone listed on the docket prior to the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge Andre Birotte Jr has been filed. Pursuant to GO 19-03 and Local Rule 72-5 MOTION to Disqualify #10 is referred to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for determination. (rn)
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 filed by Petitioner Kimball-Griffith, L.P. (Dorwin, John) Modified on 12/1/2020 (gk).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Kimball-Griffith, L.P.. (Dorwin, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Petition #1 as to respondents Brenda Wren Burman, Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board, Carpinteria Valley Water District, Does, Nicola T. Hanna, Scott McGolpin, Montecito Water District. (esa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
November 22, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner/Plaintiff Kimball-Griffith, L.P., identifying Kimball-Griffith, L.P., Loma Kimball Griffith, Catherine Eleanore Griffith, Richard David Griffith. (Dorwin, John)
November 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Petitioner/Plaintiff Kimball-Griffith, L.P.. (Dorwin, John)
November 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Receipt No: ACACDC-29145611 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner/Plaintiff Kimball-Griffith, L.P.. (Attorney John Kenneth Dorwin added to party Kimball-Griffith, L.P.(pty:pet))(Dorwin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball-Griffith, L.P. v. Brenda Wren Burman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Montecito Water District
Represented By: Walter Eric Wendelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carpinteria Valley Water District
Represented By: Dennis Neil Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda Wren Burman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nicola T. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott McGolpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cachuma Operation and Maintenance Board
Represented By: William Wesley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kimball-Griffith, L.P.
Represented By: John Kenneth Dorwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: United States of America v. 6.03 Acres of Land in the County of Santa Barbara, State of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?