Lexus Latrice Rene v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R, and Lexus Latrice Rene
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secruity Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv10789
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lexus Latrice Rene, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/17/2020, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pena, Jonathan)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #6 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, appointing LEXUS LATRICE RENE as Guardian ad Litem for S.H.R. (hr)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions: (see document for further details). (hr)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (hr)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #3 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION for Appointment of Lexus Latrice Rene as Guardian ad Litem for S.H.R LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,. (Pena, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,. (Pena, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,(pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexus Latrice Rene v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXUS LATRICE RENE o/b/o S.H.R,
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexus Latrice Rene
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secruity Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?