George Cable v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: George Cable
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv10931
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10931 ODW(RAOx). (rn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 29, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 1, 2020 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C AS ATTACHMENT TO NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 1, 2020 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Starbucks Corporation, Does 1 through 25, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff George Cable. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/28/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Plaintiff, George Cable; Defendant, Starbucks Corporation. (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Sarah Rogers re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Exhibit B as to Declaration #2 . (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Exhibit A as to Declaration #2 . (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Nicole Golob re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Minkow, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV41165 Receipt No: ACACDC-29294079 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendant's Answer) (Attorney Nicole G Minkow added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Minkow, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Cable v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Nicole G Minkow
Represented By: Danielle Samantha Krauthamer
Represented By: Nicole Golob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cable
Represented By: Joshua Cohen Slatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?