Brian Wilson v. Brandon Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Defendant: Heather Corrillo, Nyela Blackman, Kyrie Irving, Brandon Snyder, Nyela Snyder, Sean Curtis, Maria Taranga and Heather Ramirez
Case Number: 2:2020cv11058
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) Order DISCHARGING OSC re: Dismissal for Lack of SubjectMatter Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On January 11, 2021, the Court ordered Plaintiff Brian Wilson to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See generally Dkt. #10 . However, the Court has denied Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis as frivolous and dismissed the case. See generally Dkt. #9 . Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than January 29, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond by such date will result in the Court dismissing the action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, denying #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (See document for further details) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (yl)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect form utilized. The correct form should be the CV-60 issued on 12/4/20 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to waive court fees filed by Brian Wilson. (Attachments: #1 lodged proposed order) (esa)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by plaintiff Brian Wilson. (esa)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against defendants Nyela Blackman, Heather Corrillo, Sean Curtis, Kyrie Irving, Brandon Snyder, Maria Taranga.Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F Eick, filed by plaintiff Brian Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Corrillo Ramirez, #3 Summons Asti Sisco, #4 Summons Geneviene Carrillo, #5 Summons Heather Corrillo, #6 Summons Kyrie Irving, #7 Summons Sean Curtis, #8 Summons Brandon Smith, #9 Summons Kim Blackman) (esa)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to plaintiff Brian Wilson. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclosed form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: #1 CV 60) (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2020: #2 Lodged Complaint, #3 cover sheet, #4 summons CorrilloRamirez, #5 summons Sisco, #6 summons Corrillo, #7 summons Corilli, #8 summons Irving, #9 Summons Curtis, #10 summons Smith, #11 summons Blackman) (esa).
December 4, 2020 LODGED COMPLAINT: Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiff Brian Wilson. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Wilson v. Brandon Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Corrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyela Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyrie Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyela Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Taranga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?