Holly Cordan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: HOLLY CORDAN
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv11096
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The initial status conference scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. The Court sets a jury trial for 05/18/21 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 05/10/2021 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Holly Cordan. (Foster, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #11 Request to Substitute Attorney. Richard M. Foster is substituted in place of Barry S. Bernstein for plaintiff Holly Cordan. Added attorney Richard Martin Foster for Holly Cordan. Attorney Barry Steven Bernstein terminated. (mrgo)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel (1) Proposed Order (Foster, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, Richard) Modified on 1/20/2021 (mrgo).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/8/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale. (Miretsky, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 4 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
December 7, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale. Filed in State Court on 9/17/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 12/8/2020 (car).
December 7, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale, Does 1 to 10, Inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Holly Cordan. Filed in State Court on 8/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/07/2020. (Miretsky, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, identifying Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Miretsky, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/07/2020. (Miretsky, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2020-00544098-CU-PO-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-29391305 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Form Interrogatories, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Michael Miretsky added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Miretsky, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly Cordan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY CORDAN
Represented By: Barry Steven Bernstein
Represented By: Richard Martin Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Michael Miretsky
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?