Phillip Walker v. Kuldeep Kaur et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Walker
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Kuldeep Kaur
Case Number: 2:2020cv11108
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Walker, upon Defendant Kuldeep Kaur served on 12/12/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kuldeep Kaur (Defendant) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kuldeep Kaur. (esa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Phillip Walker, (Shahriari, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Phillip Walker. (Shahriari, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Phillip Walker. (Shahriari, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29395349 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Phillip Walker. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Phillip Walker(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip Walker v. Kuldeep Kaur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuldeep Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Walker
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Laura Anne Steven
Represented By: Ani A Avetisyan
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?