Nicholas Rueda v. Ritmo Latino Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rueda
Defendant: Ritmo Latino Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Does 2 through 10, inclusive, Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC and Ritmo Latino Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv11145
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC, identifying Ritmo Latino Wireless, LLC. (de Castro, Jose-Manuel)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 filed by Defendant Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC.(Attorney Jose-Manuel A. de Castro added to party Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC(pty:dft))(de Castro, Jose-Manuel)
January 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Rueda, upon Defendant Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jose Manuel de Castro, Attorney for Defendant. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendant Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC. (iv)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice (Other) #9 filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Rueda. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Amendment to Complaint of Fictitious Name DOE 1 filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Rueda. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nicholas Rueda, upon Defendant Ritmo Latino Corporation served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nancy Martinez, Managing Agent, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendant Ritmo Latino Corporation. (car)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #1 Nicholas Rueda. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Rueda. (Avrahamy, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 12/09/2020, receipt number 29431715).(Avrahamy, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying Ritmo Latino Corporation, A Delaware Corporation; and DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive. (Attorney Joseph Y Avrahamy added to party Nicholas Rueda(pty:pla))(Avrahamy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Rueda v. Ritmo Latino Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritmo Latino Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC
Represented By: Jose-Manuel A. de Castro
Represented By: David G Larmore
Represented By: Lori V Minassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritmo Latino Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rueda
Represented By: Joseph Y Avrahamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?