Christian T Kim v. Gap, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christian T. Kim
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, Banana Republic, Synchrony Bank and Gap, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11452
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Motion to Compel Arbitration #19 , IS HEREBY ADVANCED TO 03/15/2021 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Banana Republic, Gap, Inc., Synchrony Bank, identifying Synchrony Financial as Corporate Parent of Defendant Synchrony Bank and identifying Defendant The Gap, Inc. as the Corporate Parent of Defendant Banana Republic (Apparel), LLC. (Strickland, Julia)
February 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Banana Republic, Gap, Inc., Synchrony Bank. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joline White, #2 Exhibit A to White Decl - Account Agreement, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A to RJN - Certificate of Status, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Julia B Strickland added to party Banana Republic(pty:dft), Attorney Julia B Strickland added to party Gap, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Strickland, Julia)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Banana Republic answer now due 2/12/2021; Gap, Inc. answer now due 2/12/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Banana Republic; Gap, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Attorney David W Moon added to party Banana Republic(pty:dft), Attorney David W Moon added to party Gap, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moon, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julia B Strickland counsel for Defendant Synchrony Bank. Adding Julia B. Strickland as counsel of record for Synchrony Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Attorney Julia B Strickland added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft))(Strickland, Julia)
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ali Fesharaki counsel for Defendant Synchrony Bank. Adding Ali Fesharaki as counsel of record for Synchrony Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Attorney Ali Fesharaki added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft))(Fesharaki, Ali)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim, upon Defendant Gap, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Service of Process Intake Clerk in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Jae)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim, upon Defendant Banana Republic served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Service of Process Intake Clerk in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Jae)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim, upon Defendant Synchrony Bank served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Owen Watkins, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Jae)
January 10, 2021 Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) Text Only Entry. The Court has reviewed the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint #11 filed on January 8, 2021. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately file proof of service of the summons and complaint. Proof of service must be filed within 5 days of service. See Standing Order #9 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Synchrony Bank answer now due 2/12/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Attorney David W Moon added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft))(Moon, David)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Banana Republic, Gap, Inc., Synchrony Bank. (jp)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott Gregory Braden counsel for Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. Adding Scott G. Braden as counsel of record for Christian T. Kim for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. (Attorney Scott Gregory Braden added to party Christian T. Kim (pty:pla))(Braden, Scott)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Todd D Carpenter counsel for Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. Adding Todd D. Carpenter as counsel of record for Plaintiff Christian T. Kim for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. (Attorney Todd D Carpenter added to party Christian T. Kim (pty:pla))(Carpenter, Todd)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim, identifying Gap, Inc.; Banana Republic; and Synchrony Bank. (Kim, Jae)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. (Kim, Jae)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. (Kim, Jae)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29604150 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Christian T. Kim. (Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Christian T. Kim (pty:pla))(Kim, Jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian T Kim v. Gap, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Republic
Represented By: David W Moon
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: David W Moon
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Represented By: Ali Fesharaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gap, Inc.
Represented By: David W Moon
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian T. Kim
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Todd D Carpenter
Represented By: Scott Gregory Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?