In Re Application of Daniel Snyder for an Order Directing Discovery from New Content Media Inc. dba MEA WorldWide
Petitioner: Daniel Snyder and Marc J. Randazza
Respondent: New Content Media, Inc. and New Content Media, Inc. doing business as MEA WorldWide
In Re: Application of Daniel Snyder for an Order Directing Discovery from New Content Media Inc. dba MEA WorldWide
Case Number: 2:2020mc00076
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Carla M. Wirtschafter re Proof of Service of re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, #25 filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wirtschafter, Carla)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Pursuant to Rule 45(g), New Content is ORDERED to show cause why it should not be held in contempt of court or otherwise required to comply with the subpoenas in this action. New Contents written response to this OSC must be filed with the Court by noon on Friday, October 2. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Contempt against Respondent New Content Media, Inc. filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. Application set for hearing on 10/28/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rizwan Qureshi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN AID OF A FOREIGN PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. sec. 1782 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) (vm)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: INTERVENTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The intervention issue is tangential to this Courts obligation to evaluate the subpoena requests under the statute. Mr. Randazzas request to intervene in this action is denied without prejudice. The second request for subpoenas under Section 1782 will be granted under separate cover. Mr. Randazza, New Content Media, and all others retain whatever ability they may have in due course to challenge the subpoenas or seek an appropriate protective order under Rule 26. (See Minute Order for further details) #15 MOTION to Intervene (vm)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY in support of Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #15 filed by Movant Marc J. Randazza. (Shepard, Alex)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #15 filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rizwan Qureshi, #2 Exhibit V, #3 Exhibit W, #4 Exhibit X)(Wirtschafter, Carla)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #15 filed by Movant Marc J. Randazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Shepard, Alex)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO INTERVENE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioner is entitled to respond. Any response from Mr. Snyder will be due by September 14. (See Minute Order for further details) re: Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #15 . (vm)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN AID OF A FOREIGN PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. sec. 1782 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for further details) re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (vm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #15 filed by Movant Marc J. Randazza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc J. Randazza, #2 Declaration of Ronald D. Green, #3 Declaration of Ari Bass, #4 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit 2 - Default Judgment, #6 Exhibit 3 - Notice re Judgment, #7 Exhibit 4 - Washington Post Article)(Shepard, Alex)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Proposed Intervenor Marc J. Randazza. (Attorney Alex James Shepard added to party Marc J. Randazza(pty:mov)) (Shepard, Alex)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN AID OF A FOREIGN PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for further details) #13 APPLICATION for Order (vm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 Supplemental EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for GRANTING JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN AID OF A FOREIGN PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rizwan A. Qureshi, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q, #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit T, #10 Exhibit U, #11 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Jordan W. Siev APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Daniel Snyder, designating Carla M. Wirtschafter as local counsel. #8 (vm)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Rizwan A. Qureshi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Daniel Snyder, designating Carla M. Wirtschafter as local counsel. #7 (vm)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Counsel informed the court that a supplemental declaration will be filed no later than August 12, 2020. After the deadline passes, the Court will take the matter under submission. Court Recorder: AT&T 8/11/2020. (vm)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to the Declaration of Rizwan A. Qureshi in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Assistance in Aid of a Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 [Dkt. No. 1] filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L)(Wirtschafter, Carla)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jordan W. Siev to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Daniel Snyder (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27581434) filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rizwan A. Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Daniel Snyder (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27578430) filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for August 11, 2020 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing fee for Miscellaneous cases is $47.00. Counsel may e-file an Application for Refund of Fees Form G-124. (car)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rizwan Ahmad Qureshi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James C McCarroll. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Assistance in Aid of a Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1782 Receipt No: ACACDC-27534921 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Daniel Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rizwan A. Qureshi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Attorney Carla M Wirtschafter added to party Daniel Snyder(pty:pet))(Wirtschafter, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Application of Daniel Snyder for an Order Directing Discovery from New Content Media Inc. dba MEA WorldWide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New Content Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New Content Media, Inc. doing business as MEA WorldWide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Snyder
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter
Represented By: Jordan W. Siev
Represented By: Carla M. Wirtschafter
Represented By: Rizwan A. Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marc J. Randazza
Represented By: Alex James Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Application of Daniel Snyder for an Order Directing Discovery from New Content Media Inc. dba MEA WorldWide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?