Reginald Sweatman v. Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Reginald Sweatman
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv00102
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (rrey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie Chu counsel for Defendant Federal Express Corporation. Jamie Chu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Chu, Jamie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
January 6, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/5/2021, attached as Exhibit 9. (jtil)
January 6, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Reginald Sweatman in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/4/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation identifying FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Chu, Jamie)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Chu, Jamie)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation, identifying FedEx Corporation. (Chu, Jamie)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCP03636 Receipt No: ACACDC-29900775 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jamie Chu added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:dft))(Chu, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reginald Sweatman v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Sweatman
Represented By: Rodney Mesriani
Represented By: Tracy Neal Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Chu
Represented By: Thomas J Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?