Carl L Miller v. Universal Music Publishing Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carl L Miller
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Inc, -, Jody Gerson, Universal Music Publishing, Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00238
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #15 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 Second EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 3/19/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth L. Schilken, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Elizabeth L. Schilken, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Elizabeth L Schilken added to party Universal Music Publishing Group, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Schilken, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Motion to Remand (Dkt. Nos. #11 , #13 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Resolution Without Hearing in Support of Motion for Remand to State Court filed by plaintiff Carl L Miller. (jp)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc. (Schilken, Elizabeth)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Remand to State Court filed by plaintiff Carl L Miller. (jp)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #8 . Defendant may answer or respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 2/17/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc.. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Schilken)(Schilken, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Schilken, #2 Proposed Order) (Schilken, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigants email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigants email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 5-3. (esa)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
January 11, 2021 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Carl L Miller, upon Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc. served on 12/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa)
January 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Jody Gerson, Universal Music Publishing Group, Inc., filed by plaintiff Carl L Miller. (filed in state court 12/7/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing Inc identifying Universal Music Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Huben, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Universal Music Publishing Inc. (Huben, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20SMCV01886 Receipt No: ACACDC-29979101 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Universal Music Publishing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Huben, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carl L Miller v. Universal Music Publishing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Inc, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Represented By: Robert S Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?